Global Patent Index - EP 1321503 A1

EP 1321503 A1 2003-06-25 - Diesel fuel compositions containing glycerol acetal carbonates

Title (en)

Diesel fuel compositions containing glycerol acetal carbonates

Title (de)

Glycerolacetalcarbonate enthaltende Dieselkraftstoffzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de carburants diesel contenant des carbonates d'acétals de clycérol

Publication

EP 1321503 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292949 A

Priority

FR 0116448 A

Abstract (en)

Diesel fuel composition containing carbonate(s) of glycerol acetal(s). <??>Diesel fuel composition contains: <??>(A) a major proportion of conventional diesel fuel(s); and <??>(B) carbonate(s) of glycerol acetal(s) of formula (1) and/or (2). <??>R1, R2 = H, 1-20C aliphatic, cycloaliphatic or aromatic hydrocarbyl, or an alkyl-ether chain, or R1 plus R2 may form an oxygen-containing heterocycle; <??>R3 = same as R1/R2 (except H), or a group of formula (3) and/or (4).

Abstract (fr)

Une composition de carburant Diesel comprend une proportion majeure d'au moins un carburant Diesel et une proportion mineure d'au moins un carbonate d'acétal de glycérol répondant à l'une des formules générales : <IMAGE> dans lesquelles : R1 et R2 représentent chacun un atome d'hydrogène, un radical hydrocarboné de 1 à 20 atomes de carbone, aliphatique, cycloaliphatique ou aromatique, ou une chaîne alkyl-éther, R1 et R2 pouvant former ensemble un radical hétérocyclique oxygéné ; R3 est un radical défini comme R1 ou R2, sauf l'atome d'hydrogène, ou un radical de formule générale : <IMAGE> où R1 et R2 sont définis comme ci-dessus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/02; C10L 1/18; C10L 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/02 (2006.01); C10L 1/19 (2006.01); C10L 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/19 (2013.01); C10L 1/026 (2013.01); C10L 10/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321503 A1 20030625; EP 1321503 B1 20101124; AT 489448 T 20101215; DE 60238380 D1 20110105; ES 2354413 T3 20110314; FR 2833606 A1 20030620; FR 2833606 B1 20040213; US 2004025417 A1 20040212; US 7097674 B2 20060829

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60238380

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-04-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 60238380

- Effective date: 20110224

2011-03-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-03-09 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60238380 P 20110105

2010-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES NL

2010-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/02 20060101AFI20100730BHEP

2010-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 10/02 20060101ALI20100730BHEP

2010-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/19 20060101ALI20100730BHEP

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES NL

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DELFORT, BRUNO

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DURAND, ISABELLE

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JAECKER, ANNE

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LACOME, THIERRY

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MONTAGNE, XAVIER

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PAILLE, FABRICE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI