Global Patent Index - EP 1321504 A2

EP 1321504 A2 2003-06-25 - Extremely stable diesel fuel compositions

Title (en)

Extremely stable diesel fuel compositions

Title (de)

Extremstabile Dieselbrennstofzusammensetzungen.

Title (fr)

Compositions extrêmement stabiles de combustible pour moteurs Diesel.

Publication

EP 1321504 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258749 A

Priority

US 2041101 A

Abstract (en)

Diesel fuel compositions that are extremely stable against thermal degradation, sedimentation and discolouration arc devoid or essentially devoid of certain heteroatomic compounds often present in diesel fuel and which have been discovered to cause the thermal degradation in the presence of nitrate-based cetane improver additives. The specific deleterious heteroatomic compounds include pyrroles, indoles, sulfides, disulfides, mercaptans, thioacids, sulfonic acids, and indolines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/08 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/23 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 10/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/231 (2013.01); C10L 1/08 (2013.01); C10L 10/02 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 10/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321504 A2 20030625; EP 1321504 A3 20031022; CA 2411933 A1 20030618; CA 2411933 C 20090324; JP 2003193069 A 20030709; JP 3764721 B2 20060412; US 2003110684 A1 20030619

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070210

2005-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041108

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO