Global Patent Index - EP 1321512 A2

EP 1321512 A2 2003-06-25 - Rinsing and cleaning composition

Title (en)

Rinsing and cleaning composition

Title (de)

Spül-und Reinigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Composition de rincage et nettoyage

Publication

EP 1321512 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027459 A

Priority

DE 10162696 A

Abstract (en)

New polyethylene glycol hydroxy mixed ethers (I) have a linear or branched, 4-22C alk(en)yl group, a linear or branched, 4-24C 2-hydroxyalk(en)yl group and 40-80 ethylene oxide units. <??>New polyethylene glycol hydroxy mixed ethers are of formula (I): <??>R<1>O(CH2CH2O)xCH2CH(OH)R<2> (I) <??>R<1> = linear or branched, 4-22C alkyl and/or alkenyl; <??>R<2> = linear or branched, 2-22C alkyl and/or alkenyl; and <??>x = 40-80. <??>An Independent claim is also included for agents containing (I) and other usual contents for laundry, dish-washing and other detergents.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Spül- und Reinigungsmittel, enthaltend eine Kombination aus Hydroxymischether und ausgewählten anionischen Tensiden, gegebenenfalls weitere nichtionische Tenside, sowie die Verwendung derartiger Mischungen in Spül- und Reinigungsmittel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 1/831

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321512 A2 20030625; EP 1321512 A3 20030917; US 2003166488 A1 20030904

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/83 A

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/831 B

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/722 -

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/14 -

2003-09-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/22 -

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021210

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO