Global Patent Index - EP 1321514 A1

EP 1321514 A1 2003-06-25 - Liquid scouring composition containing polyethylene particles

Title (en)

Liquid scouring composition containing polyethylene particles

Title (de)

Flüssiges Reinigungsmittel mit Polyethylen-Abrasiv-Teilchen

Title (fr)

Détergent liquide à action récurante contenant du polyéthylène particulaire

Publication

EP 1321514 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01130629 A

Priority

EP 01130629 A

Abstract (en)

Liquid detergent (I) with a scouring action for cleaning solid surfaces comprises water, surfactant(s) and suspended polyethylene particles. <??>An Independent claim is also included for production of (I) by adding the ingredients to at least 20 wt.% of the water and then adding the rest of the water.

Abstract (fr)

Détergent liquide à action récurante pour le nettoyage de surfaces solides, contenant de l'eau, un ou plusieurs agents tensioactifs et du polyéthylène particulaire en suspension.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0013 (2013.01); C11D 3/3749 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321514 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070630

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE FR LU

2003-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031006

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI