Global Patent Index - EP 1321520 A1

EP 1321520 A1 2003-06-25 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACID PROBE AND NOVEL METHOD OF ASSAYING NUCLEIC ACIDS USING THE SAME

Title (en)

NOVEL NUCLEIC ACID PROBE AND NOVEL METHOD OF ASSAYING NUCLEIC ACIDS USING THE SAME

Title (de)

NEUARTIGE NUKLEINSÄURESONDE UND NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON NUKLEINSÄUREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE SONDE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ET NOUVEAU PROCEDE D'ESSAI D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES FAISANT APPEL A LADITE SONDE

Publication

EP 1321520 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02713215 A

Priority

  • JP 0203013 W
  • JP 2001090556 A

Abstract (en)

A novel nucleic acid probe for nucleic acid determination includes a single-stranded nucleic acid labeled with plural fluorescent dyes containing at least one pair of fluorescent dyes to induce FRET, the pair of fluorescent dyes including a fluorescent dye (a donor dye) capable of serving as a donor dye and a fluorescent dye (an acceptor dye) capable of serving as an acceptor dye, in which the nucleic acid probe has such a base sequence and is labeled with the fluorescent dyes so that the fluorescence intensity of the acceptor dye decreases upon hybridization with a target nucleic acid. A novel nucleic acid determination method uses the probe. The probe and method can determine one or more types of target nucleic acids in an assay system in parallel using a simple apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/09; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/566; G01N 33/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/582 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6818 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12Q 1/6818 + C12Q 2565/101 + C12Q 2565/107
  2. C12Q 1/6818 + C12Q 2565/1015 + C12Q 2565/107

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321520 A1 20030625; EP 1321520 A4 20030903; CA 2424614 A1 20030402; US 2005048485 A1 20050303; US 7273700 B2 20070925; WO 02077224 A1 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081203

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-09-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR