Global Patent Index - EP 1321535 A2

EP 1321535 A2 2003-06-25 - Material with high ballistic protection

Title (en)

Material with high ballistic protection

Title (de)

Wekstoff mit hoher ballistischer Schutzwirkung

Title (fr)

Matériau de haute protection ballistique

Publication

EP 1321535 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450278 A

Priority

  • AT 19912001 A
  • AT 19922001 A

Abstract (en)

Use of an alloy containing (in wt.%): 0.26-0.79 C, 0.2-1.2 Si, 0.2-0.9 Mn, 1.1-7.94 Cr, 0.56-3.49 Mo, 0.26-1.74 V and a balance of Fe as a material for products having a high ballistic protective action is new. The alloy contains P and S in a sum of less than 0.025 wt.%. The sum of the impurity elements As, Sb, Bi, Sn, Zn and B is less than 0.011. <??>Preferred Features: The alloy contains additions of (in wt.%): 0.36-0.64, preferably 0.41-0.58 C, 0.36-0.9, preferably 0.41-0.68 Si, 0.36-0.70, preferably 0.41-0.59 Mn, 1.1-7.94, preferably 2.61-5.2 Cr, 0.56-3.49, preferably 1.30-2.7 Mo, 0.26-1.74, preferably 0.39-0.83 V.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befasst sich mit der Verwendung einer Stahllegierung als Werkstoff für Erzeugnisse mit hoher ballistischer Schutzwirkung. Um eine hohe ballistische Schutzwirkung und eine wesentlich verbesserte Wirtschaftlichkeit bei einer Bereitstellung von dafür vorgesehenen Erzeugnissen zu erreichen, ist erfindungsgemäß für diese eine Verwendung einer Legierung enthaltend in Gew.-%: Kohlenstoff (C), 0,3 bis 0,6; Silizium (Si), 0,08 bis 0,59; Mangan (Mn), 0,1 bis 0,6; Chrom (Cr), 0,9 bis 1,5; Nickel (Ni), 2,4 bis 5,5 Eisen (Fe) sowie Verunreinigungen als Rest, mit der legierungstechnischen Maßnahme, dass der Wert für den Gehalt an Phosphor (P) plus Schwefel (S) weniger als 0,025 beträgt, die Konzentration von Molybdän (Mo) unter 0,34 und jene von Wolfram (W) unter 0,29 liegen, wobei der Summenwert von Molybdän (Mo) plus Wolfram (W) gebrochen durch zwei 0,38 nicht übersteigt und die Summe der korngrenzenwirksamen Verunreinigungselemente Arsen (As), Antimon (Sb), Wismut (Bi), Zinn (Sn), Zink (Zn) und Bor (B) kleiner ist als 0,011 als Werkstoff vorgesehen. Weiters ist gemäß der Erfindung eine per se bekannte Legierung enthaltend in Gew.-%: Kohlenstoff (C), 0,26 bis 0,79; Silizium ( Si), 0,2 bis 1,2; Mangan (Mn), 0,2 bis 0,9; Chrom (Cr), 1,1 bis 7,94; Molybdän (Mo), 0,56 bis 3,49; Vanadin (V), 0,26 bis 1,74 Eisen (Fe) sowie Begleitelemente und Verunreinigungen als Rest, mit der legierungstechnischen Maßgabe, dass der Wert für den Gehalt an Phosphor (P) plus Schwefel (S) weniger als 0,025 beträgt, die Konzentration von Nickel (Ni) unter 0,28 liegt und die Summe der korngrenzenwirksamen Verunreinigungselemente Arsen (As), Antimon (Sb), Wismut (Bi), Zinn (Sn), Zink (Zn) und Bor (B) kleiner ist als 0,011, als Werkstoff für Erzeugnisse mit hoher ballistischer Schutzwirkung verwendbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/22; C22C 38/24; C22C 38/44; C22C 38/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/24 (2006.01); C22C 38/40 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/0442 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/24 (2013.01); C22C 38/40 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321535 A2 20030625; EP 1321535 A3 20030813; EP 1321535 B1 20050323; BR 0205411 A 20040720; CA 2414305 A1 20030619; CA 2414305 C 20060815; DE 50202536 D1 20050428; ES 2238556 T3 20050901; US 2004031353 A1 20040219; US 2008181807 A1 20080731

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOHLER BLECHE GMBH

- Effective date: 20051231

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051209

2005-10-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-09-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238556 T3

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-06-23 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202536 P 20050428

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-23 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO