Global Patent Index - EP 1321547 A1

EP 1321547 A1 2003-06-25 - Cross-wound bobbin of cylindrical shape, and corresponding winding method

Title (en)

Cross-wound bobbin of cylindrical shape, and corresponding winding method

Title (de)

Zylindrische Kreuzspule und Verfahren zur Bildung des Wickelkörpers einer zylindrischen Kreuzspule

Title (fr)

Bobine croisée cylindrique, et méthode de bobinage correspondante

Publication

EP 1321547 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025455 A

Priority

DE 10162777 A

Abstract (en)

To wind cylindrical cross wound bobbins (3), at a rotor spinning machine, the wound body (12) is formed by a reciprocating yarn guide to give a yarn intersection angle ( alpha M) at the center zone (22) which is ≤ 26 degrees . The yarn angle towards the end zones (20,21) has a larger yarn intersection angle ( alpha R). The center zone of the bobbin is ≥ 50% of the total bobbin width (BWG).

Abstract (de)

Zylindrische Kreuzspule und Verfahren zur Bildung des Wickelköpers einer zylindrischen Kreuzspule. Das Verfahren dient der Bildung des Wickelkörpers (12) von zylindrischen Kreuzspulen (3) auf Rotorspinnmaschinen, wobei in einer mittleren Zone (22) des Spulenhubes der Kreuzungswinkel α kleiner als 28° ausgeführt wird und in den zu den Enden des Wickelkörpers hin gelegenen Randzonen (20,21) ein gegenüber der mittleren Zone vergrößerter Kreuzungswinkel αR erzeugt wird. Die erfindungsgemäß hergestellten zylindrischen Kreuzspulen zeichnen sich durch hohe Lauflängen, stabilen Aufbau, gute Dichteverteilung sowie hervorragende Ablaufeigenschaften aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/40; B65H 54/38; B65H 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 54/38 (2006.01); B65H 55/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/385 (2013.01); B65H 55/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321547 A1 20030625; EP 1321547 B1 20061025; CN 1269712 C 20060816; CN 1426948 A 20030702; DE 10162777 A1 20030703; DE 50208533 D1 20061207; JP 2003192229 A 20030709; US 2003116672 A1 20030626; US 6886770 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161205

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 50208533

- Effective date: 20130918

2007-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208533 P 20061207

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2006-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061025

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI