Global Patent Index - EP 1321557 A1

EP 1321557 A1 2003-06-25 - Improved drum for clothes washing machine

Title (en)

Improved drum for clothes washing machine

Title (de)

Verbesserte Trommel für eine Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Tambour amelioré pour une machine à laver

Publication

EP 1321557 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830784 A

Priority

EP 01830784 A

Abstract (en)

A drum (12) for a tub (10) of a clothes washing machine comprises a side wall (121) with a surface that is basically a surface of revolution, and a tubular part (122) attached to the said side wall (121). The tubular part (122) extends along a circumference of the wall (121) and has apertures (124) for collecting, during the rotation of the drum (12), the liquid from the bottom portion (55) of the tub (10), in order to release it over the clothes from the upper portion of the tub (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 21/04; D06F 23/02; D06F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/06 (2006.01); D06F 21/04 (2006.01); D06F 23/02 (2006.01); D06F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/065 (2013.01); D06F 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321557 A1 20030625; EP 1321557 B1 20130814

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141220

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141220

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141220

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60148234

2014-08-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60148234

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60148234

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2013-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-05-01 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 23/06 20060101ALI20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 37/06 20060101AFI20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 21/04 20060101ALI20130311BHEP

2013-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 23/02 20060101ALI20130311BHEP

2013-03-11 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60148234

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: D06F0021040000

- IPC: D06F0037060000

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061109

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI