Global Patent Index - EP 1321558 A1

EP 1321558 A1 2003-06-25 - Bellow for front-loading washing machine

Title (en)

Bellow for front-loading washing machine

Title (de)

Faltenbalg für eine frontbeschickbare Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Soufflet pour machine à laver à chargement frontal

Publication

EP 1321558 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830785 A

Priority

EP 01830785 A

Abstract (en)

Front-loading clothes washing machine comprising a container having a front wall with a loading aperture (111), a removable door (121) able to close the loading aperture, a washing tub (112) mounted inside the container and having an aperture (117) facing towards the front wall of the container, a loading drum (15) for the clothes to be washed, the drum being mounted in the washing tub (112) in such a way that it can rotate about a horizontal axis and having an aperture (16) aligned with the aperture of the tub (117) and with the loading aperture (111), a connecting duct (120) between the aperture (117) of the washing tub and the loading aperture (111) comprising a bellows-like elastic joint (120a). The machine can take a larger load because of the fact that the space comprised within the connecting duct (120) can be used as an extension of the loading space because it includes at least one basically rigid annular band (120b) that at least partly covers the elastic joint (120a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321558 A1 20030625; DE 60230108 D1 20090115; ES 2317986 T3 20090501

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080429

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061110

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI