Global Patent Index - EP 1321563 A2

EP 1321563 A2 2003-06-25 - Laundry treatment device

Title (en)

Laundry treatment device

Title (de)

Wäschebehandlungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement du linge

Publication

EP 1321563 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026596 A

Priority

DE 10163200 A

Abstract (en)

The laundry dryer has a housing (10) enclosing a rotary drum (11) and a measuring device for determining at least one parameter of the laundry or the drying air contained in the rotary drum, having a measuring sensor (5) mounted on the rotary drum cooperating with a stationary reader (7). The measured values, e.g. the laundry moisture content values, are transmitted between the sensor and the reader via a cordless link between a transmitter and a receiver.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Wäschebehandlungsvorrichtung insbesondere einen Wäschetrockner mit einem Gehäuse (10), einer drehbaren Trommel (11), die in dem Gehäuse (10) angeordnet ist, einer Messeinrichtung, die zur Erfassung wenigstens eines Parameters der in der Trommel (11) befindlichen Wäsche oder Prozessluft dient, wobei die Messeinrichtung eine Messwerterfassungseinrichtung (5) und eine am Gehäuse angeordnete Leseeinrichtung (7) umfasst. Um eine einfache Übertragung der Messwerte aus der Trommel (11) zur Leseinrichtung bereitzustellen ist die Messwerterfassungseinrichtung (5) an der Trommel (11) angeordnet und die Messwerterfassungseinrichtung (5) hat eine Sende und/oder Empfangseinrichtung, die die Messwerte der Messwerterfassungseinrichtung (5) an die Leseeinrichtung, die eine Sende- und/oder eine Empfangseinrichtung hat, drahtlos überträgt <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01); D06F 58/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2013.01); D06F 39/003 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2838 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2841 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2861 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321563 A2 20030625; EP 1321563 A3 20040421; DE 10163200 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060809

2005-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-01-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20041021

- Countries: SI

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI