Global Patent Index - EP 1321570 A2

EP 1321570 A2 2003-06-25 - A multi-layer paper web and a method of forming it

Title (en)

A multi-layer paper web and a method of forming it

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Papierbahn und Verfahren zu ihrer Blattbildung

Title (fr)

Bande de papier à couches multiples et procédé pour sa formation

Publication

EP 1321570 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02445182 A

Priority

  • SE 0104397 A
  • US 34126901 P

Abstract (en)

A method of making a multilayer paper web, wherein at least two paper sheets (24a,b) are formed and dried separately to a dry content of no more than 80% by weight, imparting a three-dimensional pattern of alternating raised and recessed portions in the paper sheets during drying, combining the paper sheets into a multilayer web, in which void volumes (32) are created between the raised and recessed portions of the combined sheets and drying the multilayer web (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/00; D21F 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21F 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/145 (2013.01); D21F 9/006 (2013.01); D21F 11/006 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01); D21F 11/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321570 A2 20030625; EP 1321570 A3 20040121

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO