Global Patent Index - EP 1321571 A2

EP 1321571 A2 2003-06-25 - Method and device for spraying a moving fibrous web

Title (en)

Method and device for spraying a moving fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Besprühen einer bewegten Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de pulvérisation d'une bande fibreuse mouvante

Publication

EP 1321571 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02016047 A

Priority

DE 10160725 A

Abstract (en)

To spray the surface of a moving web (12), especially of paper or cardboard, at least one jet (14) delivers a spray medium (16) at the web. The volume flow to the jet is adjustable, through at least one valve (20), and the medium flows through a pulsation damper (18) in its path to the jet. The medium is carried from the damper to the jet by a flexible hose (24).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Besprühen einer bewegten Faserstoffbahn 12, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, mittels wenigstens einer Düse 14 wird der Düse 14 ein vorzugsweise einstellbarer Volumenstrom des betreffenden Sprühmediums 16 über wenigstens ein Ventil 20 zugeführt, wobei im Volumenstrom des Sprühmediums 16 auftretende Pulsationen vorzugsweise gedämpft oder abgeschwächt werden. Es wird auch eine entsprechende, eine Düse 14 sowie wenigstens ein Ventil 20 umfassende Vorrichtung beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 7/00; B05B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 12/06 (2006.01); D21G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 7/00 (2013.01); B05B 12/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321571 A2 20030625; EP 1321571 A3 20040204; CA 2413792 A1 20030611; DE 10160725 A1 20030612; US 2003108678 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070227

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060105

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI