Global Patent Index - EP 1321578 A2

EP 1321578 A2 2003-06-25 - Rail fixing with good passage way for railway vehicles

Title (en)

Rail fixing with good passage way for railway vehicles

Title (de)

Schienenbefestigung zum Betrieb von Gleisförderanlagen

Title (fr)

Fixation de rails facilitant le passage de véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 1321578 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02022598 A

Priority

DE 20120831 U

Abstract (en)

Track-fixing device consists of an intermediate plate (8) under the rail foot, and an angle guiding plate (5) and a tensioning clamp on the outer side of the rail which are anchored in a sleeper body (3). A leaf spring (9) is formed so that it is supported on the inner side of the rail (1), whilst it has an inner or outer curve with its opposite-lying sides. The spring touches at a point on the inner side of the rail foot and a sleeper screw (6) is guided through the spring to anchor it in the sleeper body via a plug (7).

Abstract (de)

Die Neuerung betrifft eine Schienenbefestigung zum Betrieb von Gleisförderanlagen. Sie ist dafür bestimmt, bei Schienenbefestigungen, die nach dem Konstruktionsprinzip der Verwendung von Winkelführungsplatten ausgeführt sind, in solcherart geringem Maße Profilraum entlang des Schienenfußes sowie entlang der Schienenkammer des Schienenprofils zu beanspruchen, dass dieser Raum als Lauffläche für den Betrieb von Gleisförderanlagen zur Verfügung steht. Erfindungsgemäß ist eine Blattfeder so geformt, dass sie sich mit ihrem einen Schenkel formschlüssig in der Nut auf der Oberseite einer Winkelführungsplatte abstützt, während sie mit ihrem gegenüberliegenden Schenkel eine innere sowie eine äußere Krümmung aufweist, mit welchen diese im Querschnitt jeweils nahezu punktförmig auf der Innenseite eines Schienenfußes ruht. Eine Schwellenschraube ist durch die Blattfeder hindurchgeführt und verbindet diese mit der Winkelführungsplatte und einem darunter befindlichen Schwellenkörper. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/306 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120831 U1 20020508; DE 50205102 D1 20060105; EP 1321578 A2 20030625; EP 1321578 A3 20040428; EP 1321578 B1 20051130

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DB NETZ A.G.

- Effective date: 20071031

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-10-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-10-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50205102 P 20060105

2005-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI NL

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI NL

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041012

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040807

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DB NETZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI