Global Patent Index - EP 1321582 A2

EP 1321582 A2 2003-06-25 - Lane separator

Title (en)

Lane separator

Title (de)

Fahrbahnbegrenzung

Title (fr)

Séparateur pour voie de circulation routière

Publication

EP 1321582 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02406113 A

Priority

CH 23462001 A

Abstract (en)

Roadway demarcation for multilane roadways comprises a horizontal profile support (4) extending in the longitudinal direction of the roadway and fixed on posts (3) arranged a distance apart. The profile support is raised and lowered between a drive-over position at roadway level and a demarcation position. <??>Preferred Features: A trench (2) in the road receives the posts and the support profile in their lowered position. Demarcation segments (13) arranged in the middle of the roadway each have one profile support and at least two posts. The posts are hydraulically raised and lowered with the profile support.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fahrbahnbegrenzung für mehrspurige Fahrbahnen, bestehend aus einem im wesentlichen horizontalen, sich in Fahrbahn-Längsrichtung erstreckenden Profilträger (4) und aus von einander beabstandeten Pfosten (3), an deren oberen Enden der Profilträger (4) befestigt ist, wobei der Profilträger (4) mittels der Pfosten (3) zwischen einer in Fahrbahnniveau befindlichen Überfahr-Stellung und einer Begrenzungsposition (5) heb- und senkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 15/12; E01F 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/594 (2016.01); E01F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/12 (2013.01); E01F 9/594 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

US 5680891 A 19971028 - PRINCE KENDALL [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321582 A2 20030625; EP 1321582 A3 20040107; CH 696002 A5 20061115

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090106

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060707

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060707

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO