Global Patent Index - EP 1321583 A1

EP 1321583 A1 2003-06-25 - Trench cutting device and bearing sledge therefor

Title (en)

Trench cutting device and bearing sledge therefor

Title (de)

Schlitzwandfräsvorrichtung sowie Aufhängeschlitten hierfür

Title (fr)

Benne de forage

Publication

EP 1321583 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026892 A

Priority

DE 10163390 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a slurry wall cutting device with a mast, on which is vertically movably suspended a cutting tool by means of a retaining cable and which is connected to at least one supply hose and at least one disposal hose. For improving guidance a suspension slide is provided, which is vertically displaceably guided on the mast. On the suspension slide are provided an articulation for the retaining cable and a first hose guide pulley for the supply hose and a second hose guide pulley for the disposal hose.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schlitzwandfräsvorrichtung mit einem Mast (30), an welchem mittels eines Halteseiles eine Fräse vertikal bewegbar aufgehängt ist, welche mit mindestens einem Versorgungsschlauch und mindestens einem Entsorgungsschlauch verbunden ist. Zur Verbesserung der Führung ist ein Aufhängeschlitten (10) vorgesehen, welcher an dem Mast (30) vertikal verschiebbar geführt ist. An dem Aufhängeschlitten sind eine Anlenkung (12) für das Halteseil und eine erste Schlauchumlenkrolle (14) für den Versorgungsschlauch und eine zweite Schlauchumlenkrolle (16) für den Entsorgungsschlauch vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/18; E02D 19/18; E02F 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2006.01); E02F 5/08 (2006.01); E02D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 17/13 (2013.01); E02D 5/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 13 30 November 1998 (1998-11-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 09 31 October 1995 (1995-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321583 A1 20030625; EP 1321583 B1 20040707; CA 2412960 A1 20030621; CA 2412960 C 20070403; DE 10163390 A1 20030717; DE 10163390 B4 20050616; ZA 200209787 B 20030212

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200592 P 20040812

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO