Global Patent Index - EP 1321587 A1

EP 1321587 A1 2003-06-25 - Means for attaching a standpipe to an underground hydrant

Title (en)

Means for attaching a standpipe to an underground hydrant

Title (de)

Standrohraufsatz für Standrohre zum Anschluss an Trinkwasser-Unterflurhydranten

Title (fr)

Moyen de fixation d'une colonne tubulaire à une prise d'eau souterraine

Publication

EP 1321587 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027357 A

Priority

DE 10162006 A

Abstract (en)

A one-part housing (10) has a central shut-off part (5) and several outlets (9), which are separated by a system divider. This consists of a securing cartridge (7) on the intake side, and a back pressure valve (8) on the outlet side. The outlets are positioned in a ring around the back pressure valve and connected to it via ring chamber (3). All components are enclosed by a protective basket (10a). Basket, cartridge, and valve are accessible from above for maintenance purposes. The basket is fastened non-turnable to the stand pipe (4) and has a turning ring (12) to fasten the pipe to the hydrant.

Abstract (de)

Um einen neuen Standrohraufsatz für Standrohre zu schaffen, der bereits eine Sicherungseinrichtung für Flüssigkeiten der Gefahrenklasse 4 enthält, sind in einem einteiligen Gehäuse (10) gegebenenfalls eine zentrale Absperrung (5) sowie mehrere Abgänge (9) untergebracht. Die zentrale Absperrung (5) und die Abgänge (9) sind durch einen Systemtrenner (15) voneinander getrennt, der aus einer eingangsseitigen Sicherungskartusche (7) und einem ausgangsseitigen Rückflußverhinderer (8 bzw. 14) besteht. Die Abgänge (9) sind ringförmig um den Rückflußverhinderer (8; 14) herum angeordnet und über eine als Hinterdruckzone (3) wirksame Ringkammer mit diesem verbunden. Alle Absperrorgane sind in einem Schutzkorb (10a) untergebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03B 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03B 9/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321587 A1 20030625; DE 10162006 C1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071205

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO