Global Patent Index - EP 1321590 A1

EP 1321590 A1 2003-06-25 - Apparatus for flushing toilet bowl with help of pressurised water plug

Title (en)

Apparatus for flushing toilet bowl with help of pressurised water plug

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spülen eines Toilettenbeckens mit Hilfe eines Druckwasserpfropfens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rinçage d'une cuvette de toilette à l'aide de bouchon d'eau

Publication

EP 1321590 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027475 A

Priority

  • DE 20120168 U
  • DE 10212287 A

Abstract (en)

Process for flushing a toilet bowl (10) comprises feeding flushing water from a fresh water supply via nozzles (11) into the toilet bowl, and removing the flushing water, and solid and liquid waste using gravity or a vacuum. Initially a pressurized water plug is formed in the connecting pipe between the fresh water supply and the toilet bowl. The fresh water flows freely between the upper limit of the pressurized water plug and the outlet of the fresh water from the fresh water supply, and after this free-flowing section (13) flows under pressure onto the pressurized water plug. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a device used for carrying out the above process comprising a free-flowing section for the fresh water after a pipe separator (12), and a receiving line (15) receiving fresh water in the form of a plug and feeding the fresh water under pressure to the flushing nozzles.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Spülen von Toilettenbecken (10), bei welchem einem vorhandenen Frischwasserversorgungsnetz (z.B. 4bar) Spülwasser entnommen und über Düsen (11) in das Toilettenbecken (10) geleitet wird, wobei das Spülwasser, Ablaufmasse und - flüssigkeit mit Hilfe von Schwerkraft oder Vakuum abgeführt werden. In der Verbindungs-leitung (15,40,20) zwischen dem Frischwasserversorgungs- und dem Toilettenbecken (10) wird zunächst ein Druckwasserpfropfen gebildet. Zwischen der oberen Begrenzung des Druckwasserpfropfens und dem Austritt des Frischwassers aus dem Frischwasserversorgungsnetz strömt das Frischwasser frei und trifft unter Druck auf den Druckwasserpfropfen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 3/00 (2006.01); E03D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/102 (2013.01); E03D 3/00 (2013.01); E03D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321590 A1 20030625; EP 1321590 B1 20060809; DE 50207778 D1 20060921

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207778

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207778 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLAAS, OLIVER

2006-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR FLUSHING TOILET BOWL WITH HELP OF PRESSURISED WATER PLUG

2004-07-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO