Global Patent Index - EP 1321593 A2

EP 1321593 A2 2003-06-25 - Panel for rebound wall element or acoustical element

Title (en)

Panel for rebound wall element or acoustical element

Title (de)

Platte als Prallwandelement und Akustikelement

Title (fr)

Panneau pour élément de paroi de rebond ou élément acoustique

Publication

EP 1321593 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450291 A

Priority

AT 20212001 A

Abstract (en)

Plate comprises two outer layers (1), and a middle layer (2) containing hollow chambers (12). <??>Preferred Features: The middle layer consists of wooden slats (10) the length of the plate which are glued together and to at least one of the outer layers. The outer layers are made of a wood material.

Abstract (de)

Eine Platte, die als Prallwandelement oder als Akustikelement ausgebildet sein kann, besitzt zwei äußere Lagen (1, 3) und eine mittlere Lage (2). In der mittleren Lage (2) sind Hohlräume (12) vorgesehen, die bei Ausbildung der Platte als Prallwandelement, beispielsweise als in mehreren Ebenen angeordnete Schlitze (12), die sich parallel zur Ebene der Platte erstrecken, ausgebildet sind. Durch die Anordnung von Schlitzen (12) in der als Prallwandelement ausgebildeten Platte taucht die einem Raum zugekehrte äußere Lage (1) ohne große Masseträgheit ein und Aufprallenergie wird bei kleinen Durchbiegungsmulden der äußeren Lage (15) wirksam absorbiert. Wenn die Platte als Akustikelement ausgebildet ist, sind die in der mittleren Lage (2) vorgesehenen Hohlräume nach wenigstens einer äußeren Lage (1) oder (3) in durch Löcher oder Schlitze offen, so daß die Hohlräume Schall nach Art eines Helmholtzresonators absorbieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/86; E04F 15/20; E04F 15/22; E04H 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 15/20 (2006.01); E04F 15/22 (2006.01); E04H 3/10 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/10 (2013.01); E04B 1/86 (2013.01); E04F 13/0867 (2013.01); E04F 15/20 (2013.01); E04F 15/22 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8461 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8476 (2013.01); E04B 2001/848 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8485 (2013.01); E04B 2001/849 (2013.01); E04F 2203/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321593 A2 20030625; EP 1321593 A3 20040407

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041008

2005-02-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/86 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04H 3/10 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 15/20 B

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 15/22 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO