Global Patent Index - EP 1321602 A1

EP 1321602 A1 2003-06-25 - Formwork for concrete structure

Title (en)

Formwork for concrete structure

Title (de)

Schalung für Betonstruktur

Title (fr)

Coffrage pour structure en béton

Publication

EP 1321602 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02394012 A

Priority

  • EP 02394012 A
  • EP 01205153 A

Abstract (en)

Formwork apparatus (100) for forming a detail in a concrete structure comprises at least one formwork shuttering panel (101) and a forming element such as a boot (104) movably mounted relative to the shuttering panel (101). Forming element (104) is supported by an arm (105) which in turn is supported by a clamp (102) which is removably attached to upper edge (103) of the shuttering panel (101) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 13/00 (2006.01); E04G 15/06 (2006.01); E04G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 15/068 (2013.01); E04G 13/00 (2013.01); E04G 21/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321602 A1 20030625; AU 2002351155 A1 20030715; AU 2002351155 A8 20030715; WO 03056115 A2 20030710; WO 03056115 A3 20040212

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI