Global Patent Index - EP 1321603 A2

EP 1321603 A2 2003-06-25 - Pre-fabricated concrete niche

Title (en)

Pre-fabricated concrete niche

Title (de)

Vorgefertigte Betonniche

Title (fr)

Niche préfabriquée en béton

Publication

EP 1321603 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02380259 A

Priority

ES 200102783 A

Abstract (en)

Pre-fabricated vibrated concrete niche referred to having two paralels slots (C) in the bottom side (D) Fig2, where will be inserted two paralels teeth (A) in the upper side (E) Fig. 1 of the niche and, in this way, will be possible to surmonting several niches mading a solid structure without fixing the niches with cement or others products. Ithe mobility of this niche is garanted for two slots in the bottom part (B) Fig. 1-2 just mde with the right size to recive an elevator also if surmonted,: In this way will be possible to reorganize the space in the cementery or, if necesary to move it in a different place without destroing the niches or opening them. As the niche is produced in just one piece and a cover will be complitly water resistant giving the opportunity to use it also under grownd. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 13/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321603 A2 20030625; EP 1321603 A3 20040128

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-11-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO