Global Patent Index - EP 1321605 A2

EP 1321605 A2 2003-06-25 - Actuation handle

Title (en)

Actuation handle

Title (de)

Betätigungshandhabe

Title (fr)

Poignée d'actionnement

Publication

EP 1321605 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027871 A

Priority

DE 10163707 A

Abstract (en)

Operating handle, especially a window handle (10), comprises a main handle part (11) and a handle head (12) which change into a handle neck (13), a bore (15) for receiving in a form-locking manner a polygonal driver (25), and a base body (20) positioning the handle neck and having cams (24) for fixing on a stop surface, e.g. in a window frame, and provided with catch devices for fixing preferred handle positions. The base body axially snaps in the handle neck and is connected to a catch body (30) directly interacting with catch elements located inside the handle neck. <??>Preferred Features: The base body has a central bore which movably positions and guides a bushing (32) guiding the polygonal driver inside the handle neck. The base body has a sliding ring (38) in which the handle neck is positioned.

Abstract (de)

Eine Betätigungshandhabe, z.B. ein Fenstergriff 10, hat im Griffhals 13 ein Loch 15 für einen Vierkant-Mitnehmer 25. Ein Grundkörper 20 lagert den Griffhals 13 und ist von ihm axial einspringend umschlossen; er wird mit Nocken 24 an einer Anschlagfläche befestigt. Eine zentrische Bohrung 26 lagert eine von dem Vierkant 25 durchsetzte, diesen innen führende Buchse 32. Der Grundkörper 20 ist zudem mit einem äußeren Gleitring 38 im Griffhals 12 gelagert bzw. geführt. Ein Rastkörper 30 hat oder bildet eine Verdrehsicherung, d.h. ein mit der Buchse 32 einstückiges Federelement 40 mit z.B. zwei bogenförmigen Stegen 42 oder Doppelstegen 68, die Rastnasen 44 tragen, um mit im Griffhals-Inneren 14 befindlichen Rastelementen 18 bevorzugte Griffpositionen festzulegen. Der Vierkant 25 ist von Spreizteilen 48 einer Dübelbuchse 45 umschlossen, die ein Hülsenteil 46 in der Buchse 32 lagert. Von einem Flansch 22 des Grundkörpers 20 stehen die Nocken 24 parallel zur Achse der Bohrung 26 ab; sie haben schräg dazu verlaufende Gewindelöcher 34, in die Schrauben 35 einziehbar sind. Eine verriegel- oder abchließbare Bauform hat einen im Griffhals 12 verschieblichen Riegelbolzen 55 zum Eingriff in eine Höhlung 62 wenigstens eines Grundkörper-Fortsatzes 60. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/00; E05B 3/06; E05B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/00 (2006.01); E05B 13/10 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 3/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/10 (2013.01); E05B 3/00 (2013.01); E05B 13/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321605 A2 20030625; EP 1321605 A3 20061227; EP 1321605 B1 20090923; AT 443800 T 20091015; DE 10163707 A1 20030703; DE 50213865 D1 20091105

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091213

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2011-03-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091224

2010-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100624

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-07-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100103

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-04-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2010-02-26 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090923

2009-11-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213865 P 20091105

2009-10-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV

2009-09-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ECKHARDT, MARTIN, DR.

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUDWIG, MANFRED

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STINGL, SUSANNE

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLEIS, MATTHIAS

2007-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2007-09-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070407

- Countries: LT

2007-09-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070407

- Countries: LV

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070407

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 3/00 20060101AFI20030423BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 13/10 20060101ALI20061121BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 9/02 20060101ALI20061121BHEP

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO