Global Patent Index - EP 1321608 A1

EP 1321608 A1 2003-06-25 - Retractable shank key

Title (en)

Retractable shank key

Title (de)

Schlüssel mit einziehbarem Schlüsselschaft

Title (fr)

Clé à tige escamotable

Publication

EP 1321608 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02028233 A

Priority

FR 0116342 A

Abstract (en)

The key (10) has a sliding shank (14) that is deployed lengthwise from a housing (12) by the force of a spring (22) with its end acting directly on the shank. The shank is held in the retracted position inside the housing by a locking mechanism (54, 58) against the effort of the spring, which is located in a cavity separated by a partition from the one containing the shank. The end of the spring has a radial projection that is attached to the key shank.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose une clé (10), notamment de véhicule automobile, du type comportant une tige (14) escamotable qui s'étend selon une direction sensiblement longitudinale et qui est montée coulissante longitudinalement à l'intérieur d'un boîtier (12) formant tête de manoeuvre de la clé (10), entre une position arrière rétractée dans laquelle au moins un tronçon de la tige (14) est reçu à l'intérieur d'un logement du boîtier (12), et une position avant d'utilisation dans laquelle au moins un tronçon d'extrémité avant (20) de la tige (14) s'étend à l'extérieur du boîtier (12), et du type comportant un ressort (22) de rappel de la tige (14) vers sa position d'utilisation, et des moyens de blocage (48, 54, 58) de la tige (14) en position rétractée à l'encontre de l'effort élastique de rappel exercé par le ressort (22), caractérisée en ce qu'une extrémité (24) du ressort de rappel (22) agit directement sur la tige (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/04; A45C 11/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/32 (2006.01); E05B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/046 (2013.01); A45C 11/328 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321608 A1 20030625; EP 1321608 B1 20060426; DE 60210913 D1 20060601; DE 60210913 T2 20061221; ES 2263731 T3 20061216; FR 2833637 A1 20030620; FR 2833637 B1 20041001

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60210913

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S., CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 60210913

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60210913

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60210913

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2014-10-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121217

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121216

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2263731 T3

2006-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60210913 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CANARD, M. LOUIS

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO