Global Patent Index - EP 1321619 A2

EP 1321619 A2 2003-06-25 - Drive control apparatus in combination with signalling and notification, a drive with such an apparatus and a process of operating therefor

Title (en)

Drive control apparatus in combination with signalling and notification, a drive with such an apparatus and a process of operating therefor

Title (de)

Antriebssteuervorrichtung mit Kombination aus Signal und Meldung, damit versehene Antriebsvorrichtung und Betriebs-Verfahren hierfür

Title (fr)

Appareil de contrôle d'entraînement en combinaison de signaux et de notification, un entraînement avec un tel appareil et son procédé de fonctionnement

Publication

EP 1321619 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026311 A

Priority

DE 20120655 U

Abstract (en)

A monitoring system is used with such as motor driven garage doors to indicate a range of status conditions. A range of normal and abnormal conditions may be determined based upon sensor signals and output either in acoustic or displayed form can be provided.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antriebssteuervorrichtung (8) zum Steuern einer Antriebseinheit (2) zum Antreiben eines beweglichen Abschlusses (5) für Gebäude oder Einfriedungen, insbesondere Torantriebssteuerungsvorrichtung (8), mit einer Betriebszustandsinformationseinrichtung (1, 6), welche eine Bedienperson über Betriebszustände der Antriebssteuervorrichtung (8) und/oder der zu steuernden Antriebseinheit (2) bzw. des anzutreibenden Abschlusses (5) insbesondere über Zustände, die ein Eingreifen der Bedienperson erfordern, informiert. Um unnötige Serviceeinsätze zu verhindern wird vorgeschlagen, dass die Betriebszustandsinformationseinrichtung (1, 6) eine Kombinationssignalabgabeeinrichtung zum Abgeben einer Kombination eines Warnsignals mit einer den Betriebszustand, vorzugsweise ohne Zuhilfenahme weiterer Informationen, klar anzeigenden Meldung aufweist. Außerdem betrifft die Erfindung eine damit versehene Antriebsvorrichtung sowie ein Betriebsverfahren hierfür. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16; E05F 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2015.01); E05F 15/668 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2013.01); E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05F 15/41 (2013.01); E05F 15/42 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/814 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/816 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/822 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/106 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/71 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/73 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120655 U1 20020418; EP 1321619 A2 20030625; EP 1321619 A3 20051228

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100713

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080506

2006-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-12-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-12-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05F 15/16 A

2005-12-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05F 15/20 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI