Global Patent Index - EP 1321621 A2

EP 1321621 A2 2003-06-25 - Sun protection lamella

Title (en)

Sun protection lamella

Title (de)

Sonnenschutzlamelle

Title (fr)

Lamelle de protection solaire

Publication

EP 1321621 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023119 A

Priority

DE 10163499 A

Abstract (en)

The slatted frame has opposite-facing profiles (6) extending along the length of the sun-shade slat (2). The slats are joined by transverse struts (5). An extensible covering layer (10) made of sheeting and or fabric is fixed to the slatted frame, and is pre-tensioned by holders holding it to at least one profile and or transverse strut.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Sonnenschutzlamelle mit einem Lamellenrahmen, der aus gegenüberliegenden, sich über die Länge der Sonnenschutzlamelle erstreckenden Profilen und diese miteinander verbindenden Querstreben gebildet ist, und einer am Lamellenrahmen befestigten Deckschicht. Um eine leichte Konstruktion mit dauerhafter Formbeständigkeit zu ermöglichen, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, die Deckschicht aus einem dehnbaren Folienund/oder Gewebematerial herzustellen, die von Haltern an zumindest einem Profil und/oder einer Querstrebe unter Vorspannung ortsfest gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/084; E06B 9/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/386 (2013.01); E06B 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321621 A2 20030625; EP 1321621 A3 20040102; EP 1321621 B1 20110720; EP 1321621 B8 20120215; AT 517221 T 20110815

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170904

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50215131

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2011-11-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COLT INTERNATIONAL LICENSING LTD., HAVANT, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: COLT INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS AG, BAAR, CH

- Document: DE 50215131

- Effective date: 20110719

2011-11-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: COLT INTERNATIONAL LICENSING LTD., HAVANT, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: COLT INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS AG, BAAR, CH

- Document: DE 50215131

- Effective date: 20110929

2011-09-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50215131

- Effective date: 20110908

2011-08-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COLT INTERNATIONAL LICENSING LIMITED

2011-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2011-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 7/084 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/386 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI