Global Patent Index - EP 1321643 A1

EP 1321643 A1 2003-06-25 - Device and method for after-treatment of exhaust gases

Title (en)

Device and method for after-treatment of exhaust gases

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Nachbehandlung von Abgasen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de post-traitement des gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1321643 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02028305 A

Priority

DE 10162383 A

Abstract (en)

The exhaust gas treatment device has a reduction stage (14) for nitrous oxides inserted in the exhaust gas line (16) close to the engine (1), upstream of a device (24,26) for removal of particles and nitrous oxides. The reduction stage is heated by the engine exhaust gases, for reduction of nitrous oxides in engine operating conditions in which the subsequent device is non-operational, e.g. at low engine loadings or revs. <??>An Independent claim for a method for treatment of diesel engine exhaust gases is also included.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Anordnung bzw. ein Verfahren zur Nachbehandlung von Abgasen, insbesondere einer Dieselbrennkraftmaschine (1), vorgeschlagen, bei der stromaufwärts eine Einrichtung (24,26;30) zur Beseitigung von Partikeln und Stickoxiden ein über eine Abgasleitung (16,22) mit der Einrichtung (24,26;30) verbundenes Mittel (14) zur Reduktion von Stickoxiden nahe der Brennkraftmaschine (1) zum Einsatz kommt. Dieses Mittel (14) gewährleistet eine Reduktion von Stickoxiden in Betriebssituationen der Brennkraftmaschine (1), in denen die Einrichtung (24,26;30) hierzu nicht aktiv ist, insbesondere bei niedriger Last und/oder niedriger Drehzahl der Brennkraftmaschine (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/08; F01N 3/025

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/023 (2006.01); F01N 3/025 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/029 (2006.01); F01N 3/035 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/32 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01); F02B 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0293 (2013.01); F01N 3/023 (2013.01); F01N 3/0231 (2013.01); F01N 3/0253 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0871 (2013.01); F01N 3/0885 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F01N 13/0093 (2014.06); F01N 3/035 (2013.01); F01N 3/0814 (2013.01); F01N 3/0821 (2013.01); F01N 3/2006 (2013.01); F01N 3/32 (2013.01); F01N 2250/02 (2013.01); F01N 2250/12 (2013.01); F01N 2250/14 (2013.01); F01N 2430/06 (2013.01); F01N 2570/14 (2013.01); F02B 37/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321643 A1 20030625; EP 1321643 B1 20041013; DE 10162383 A1 20030717

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131217

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131217

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201277 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO