Global Patent Index - EP 1321649 A1

EP 1321649 A1 2003-06-25 - Method for the reduction of deposits on valves in gas suction devices

Title (en)

Method for the reduction of deposits on valves in gas suction devices

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reduzierung von Ablagerungen an Klappen in Gasansaugsystemen

Title (fr)

Procédé de réduction de dépôts sur les vannes dans les systèmes d'admission de gaz

Publication

EP 1321649 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130762 A

Priority

EP 01130762 A

Abstract (en)

Process for controlling one or more flaps (6, 10) in air intake systems (9) of reciprocating internal combustion engines (1) comprises operating the flaps during operation of the engine in a region from 0 (fully closed) to 90 degrees (fully opened), opening the flaps in a direction of rotation, and closing the flaps in the opposite direction. The flaps are opened from 0 degrees for a short time against the direction of rotation. <??>Preferred Features: The flaps are periodically opened against the direction of rotation. The flaps are opened shortly before starting the engine or before and/or shortly after switching off the engine.

Abstract (de)

Bei Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschinen kann es im Laufe des Betriebes zu Ablagerungen vor Klappen im Luftansaugsystem kommen. Diese Ablagerungen verringern den Querschnitt der Luftansaugsysteme insbesondere bei nur geringen Öffnungswinkeln der Klappen. Durch kurzzeitiges Öffnen der Klappen entgegen der im Betrieb üblichen Bewegungsrichtung läßt sich ein Aufbau von Ablagerungen verhindern oder zumindest deutlich verringern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10; F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2013.01); F02D 9/1095 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0247 (2013.01); F02D 2009/025 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0277 (2013.01); F02D 2011/108 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 20 10 July 2001 (2001-07-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 20 10 July 2001 (2001-07-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 06 22 September 2000 (2000-09-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321649 A1 20030625; EP 1321649 B1 20060208; DE 50108899 D1 20060420

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121222

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108899

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121222

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111230

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108899 P 20060420

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORD GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI