Global Patent Index - EP 1321652 A1

EP 1321652 A1 2003-06-25 - Method to control the negative pressure in a fuel tank of a vehicle

Title (en)

Method to control the negative pressure in a fuel tank of a vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung des Kraftstofftankunterdrucks eines Fahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Procédé de régulation de la dépression dans un réservoir à carburant pour automobile

Publication

EP 1321652 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02293193 A

Priority

FR 0116531 A

Abstract (en)

The purge vacuum monitoring method for a motor vehicle fuel tank for vacuum generated by a fuel vapor absorber (1) mounted in the purge circuit (4). The method involves estimating the vacuum in the tank dependent on a preset time (ti) following a given formula. The formula includes the pressure value, the atmospheric pressure, gas mass in tank, gas volume in tank and temperature. <??>Claims include a vehicle internal combustion engine using the method.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de régulation de la dépression dans un réservoir 2 à carburant pour automobile générée par un purge d'un absorbeur 1 de vapeurs de carburant au moyen d'un actionneur 6 électromagnétique monté dans le circuit 4 de purge de l'absorbeur, ie procédé étant caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend : une étape d'estimation en boucle ouverte et à intervalle de temps (ti) déterminé, de la dépression régnant dans le réservoir selon la formule : ΔPres(ti) = Patmo - ((r×T) / (Vgasres(ti))) × Mgazres(ti) ou ΔPres(ti) correspond à l'estimation de la valeur de la dépression à l'instant ti, Patmo correspond à la pression atmosphérique, Mgazres(ti) une estimation de la masse de gaz présent dans le réservoir fonction de ΔPres(ti-1) et du sens de déplacement du gaz entre le réservoir et l'absorbeur, r est la constant du gaz présent dans le réservoir, T la température en Kelvin du gaz, Vgasres(ti) correspond au volume de gaz présent dans le réservoir. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 35/00; F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/089 (2013.01); F02D 41/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321652 A1 20030625; EP 1321652 B1 20041013; DE 60201570 D1 20041118; DE 60201570 T2 20050331; FR 2833999 A1 20030627; FR 2833999 B1 20040130

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60201570 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO