Global Patent Index - EP 1321661 A2

EP 1321661 A2 2003-06-25 - Fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1321661 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02017114 A

Priority

DE 10163908 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel injection valve comprises a valve body (1) having a valve seat (9) with a first annular groove (36) running in a radial plane of a bore (3), and a parallel second annular groove (38) arranged downstream of the first annular groove. <??>Preferred Features: An annular edge (34) lies within the second annular groove when the valve needle is in the closed position. The angle (d2) between a second conical surface (32) and the conical valve seat is greater than the angle (d1) between a first conical surface (30) and the valve seat.

Abstract (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen mit einem Ventilkörper (1), in dem in einer Bohrung (3) eine kolbenförmige Ventilnadel (5) längsverschiebbar angeordnet ist. Zwischen der Ventilnadel (5) und der Wand der Bohrung (3) ist ein mit Kraftstoff befüllbarer Druckraum (19) ausgebildet, aus dem Kraftstoff wenigstens einer am brennraumseitigen Ende der Bohrung (3) ausgebildeten Einspritzöffnung (11) zufließen kann. Am brennraumseitigen Ende der Bohrung (3) ist ein konischer Ventilsitz (9) ausgebildet, an dem die Ventilnadel (5) in ihrer Schließstellung mit einer an ihrem brennraumseitigen Ende ausgebildeten Ventildichtfläche (7) zur Abdichtung der wenigstens einen Einspritzöffnung (11) gegen den Druckraum (19) zur Anlage kommt. Die Ventildichtfläche (7) umfasst eine erste konische Fläche (30) und eine zweite konische Fläche (32). Im Ventilsitz (9) verläuft in einer Radialebene der Bohrung (3) eine erste Ringnut (36) und eine stromabwärts der ersten Ringnut (36) und parallel zu dieser angeordneten zweite Ringnut (38) (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1873 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 61/1866 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SK

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321661 A2 20030625; EP 1321661 A3 20050713; EP 1321661 B1 20090916; DE 10163908 A1 20030703; DE 50213847 D1 20091029; JP 2003201938 A 20030718; US 2003132413 A1 20030717; US 6789783 B2 20040914

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213847

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50213847

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100730

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090916

2009-10-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213847 P 20091029

2009-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SK

2009-09-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080225

2006-04-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SK

2006-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-07-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI