Global Patent Index - EP 1321663 A2

EP 1321663 A2 2003-06-25 - Fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1321663 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024857 A

Priority

DE 10162385 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel injection device for an internal combustion engine comprises a valve element (54) with a sealing surface (60) which interacts with a valve seat (64) to control an inlet opening (62) leading from a feed pump into the cylinder bore (52) and which completely closes the inlet opening in a position in which it lies with the sealing surface on the valve seat. <??>Preferred Features: The valve element does not release with its outer casing a through flow cross-section during a return stroke (h) away from the valve seat. After the empty stroke the outer casing (56) releases an increasingly greater stroke-dependent through flow cross-section. The sealing surface of the valve element tapers conically toward the end of the valve element.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Förderpumpe (12) auf, durch die Kraftstoff aus einem Kraftstoffvorratsbehälter (10) zur Saugseite einer Hochdruckpumpe (14) gefördert wird, wobei die Hochdruckpumpe (14) abhängig von Betriebsparametern der Brennkraftmaschine Kraftstoff in einen Speicher (16) fördert, mit einer Kraftstoffzumeßeinrichtung (44) zur Einstellung der durch die Hochdruckpumpe (14) in den Speicher (16) geförderten Kraftstoffmenge, wobei die Kraftstoffzumeßeinrichtung (44) einen Aktor (45) und ein durch diesen betätigtes Regelventil (46) aufweist, wobei das Regelventil (46) ein in einer Zylinderbohrung (52) eines Ventilgehäuses (50) geführtes schieberförmiges Ventilglied (54) aufweist, das durch den Aktor (45) gegen eine Rückstellkraft (68) verschiebbar ist, und wobei das Ventilglied (54) mit seinem Außenmantel (56) in Zusammenwirkung mit einem Ablauf (58) aus der Zylinderbohrung (52) einen Durchflußquerschnitt von der Förderpumpe (12) zur Hochdruckpumpe (14) steuert. Das Ventilglied (54) wirkt mit einer Dichtfläche (60) mit einem Ventilsitz (64) zur Steuerung einer von der Förderpumpe (12) herführenden, in die Zylinderbohrung (52) mündenden Zulauföffnung (62) zusammen und verschließt in einer Stellung, in der es mit der Dichtfläche (60) am Ventilsitz (64) anliegt, die Zulauföffnung (62) vollständig. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02; F02M 59/34; F02M 59/36; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 53/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/34 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02M 69/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 53/00 (2013.01); F02M 59/06 (2013.01); F02M 59/34 (2013.01); F02M 63/0001 (2013.01); F02M 63/004 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 69/52 (2013.01); F02M 2200/60 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19853103 A1 20000525 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321663 A2 20030625; EP 1321663 A3 20030702; AU 2002363846 A1 20030630; DE 10261780 A1 20030703; DE 10295868 D2 20041111; JP 2003222059 A 20030808; US 2003136384 A1 20030724; WO 03052262 A1 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-04-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI