Global Patent Index - EP 1321664 A2

EP 1321664 A2 2003-06-25 - Fuel injection system with an apparatus for removing air from fuel

Title (en)

Fuel injection system with an apparatus for removing air from fuel

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem mit einer Vorrichtung zum Entlüften von Kraftstoff

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant avec dispositif pour extraction d'air du carburant

Publication

EP 1321664 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02027840 A

Priority

  • JP 2001381415 A
  • JP 2002310524 A

Abstract (en)

A pressure reducing valve (6) of an accumulation type fuel injection system of a multi-cylinder diesel engine opens during an engine starting operation or an idling operation immediately following the engine starting operation for a period corresponding to cooling water temperature or fuel temperature. Thus, the fuel in a high-pressure fuel passage leading from a fuel supply pump (3) to fuel injection valves (2) through the common rail (1) is discharged into a fuel tank (5). Accordingly, air entering the fuel supply pump (3) while the engine is stopped is discharged to the fuel tank (5) through fuel recirculating passages (13, 15, 16). As a result, the air delivered from the fuel supply pump (3) to the injector (2) is minimized and injection quantity control is stabilized when the engine is started.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/02; F02M 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/20 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/20 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/065 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02M 37/0052 (2013.01); F02M 55/00 (2013.01); F02M 55/007 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0606 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321664 A2 20030625; EP 1321664 A3 20071031; EP 1321664 B1 20081022; DE 60229485 D1 20081204; JP 2003239823 A 20030827; JP 3901073 B2 20070404

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60229485

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090723

2009-07-01 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20090605

2008-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60229485 P 20081204

2008-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080111

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2007-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 63/02 20060101AFI20030310BHEP

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 55/00 20060101ALI20070926BHEP

2007-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 37/20 20060101ALI20070926BHEP

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO