Global Patent Index - EP 1321665 A2

EP 1321665 A2 2003-06-25 - An engine injector tester

Title (en)

An engine injector tester

Title (de)

Prüfeinrichtung einer Einspritzdüse für eine Brennkraftmachine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'essai d'injecteur pour un moteur

Publication

EP 1321665 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258708 A

Priority

GB 0130676 A

Abstract (en)

An engine injector tester comprising a source (30) of fluid pressure, an injector mount (20) for receiving an injector (18) to be tested and connected to receive fluid from the tester, and pressure transmission means (40, 74) to transmit fluid pressure from the said source (30) to the injector mount (20). Pressure adjustment means (52) are also provided which serve to enable selection of a given pressure of fluid to be communicated to the injector mount (20) via the said pressure transmission means (40, 74). Fluid flow measurement means (78) of the tester are connected to provide a measure of flow rate of the fluid through the injector (18) when the tester is in use. The tester further comprises pressure burst means (40) to enable pressure to be transmitted from the said source (30) to the injector mount (20) as a burst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00; F02M 59/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321665 A2 20030625; EP 1321665 A3 20031001; GB 0130676 D0 20020206

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 65/00 A

2003-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/18 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO