Global Patent Index - EP 1321666 A1

EP 1321666 A1 2003-06-25 - ENGINE STARTER

Title (en)

ENGINE STARTER

Title (de)

ANLASSER FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DEMARREUR DE MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1321666 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01972568 A

Priority

  • JP 0108518 W
  • JP 2000297265 A
  • JP 2000296975 A

Abstract (en)

In engine starter system adapted to crank an engine first in a reverse direction, and finally in a normal direction with an electric motor that is connected to a crankshaft of an engine, to ensure a successful cranking at all times, an electric current is supplied to the electric motor for a normal rotation prior to cranking the engine in the reverse direction to move the crankshaft to a suitable angular position at least under a prescribed condition. This control can be accomplished without requiring any special angle sensor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02N 5/04 (2006.01); F02N 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 19/005 (2013.01); F02N 11/0859 (2013.01); F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2017 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2250/06 (2013.01); F02N 5/04 (2013.01); F02N 11/04 (2013.01); F02N 11/0814 (2013.01); F02N 2019/007 (2013.01); F02N 2300/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321666 A1 20030625; EP 1321666 A4 20061227; AU 9228801 A 20020408; CN 1214184 C 20050810; CN 1466658 A 20040107; JP WO2002027181 A1 20040205; WO 0227181 A1 20020404

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081222

2006-12-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061124

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI