Global Patent Index - EP 1321667 A1

EP 1321667 A1 2003-06-25 - ENGINE STARTER

Title (en)

ENGINE STARTER

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTMASCHINENANLASSER

Title (fr)

DEMARREUR DE MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1321667 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01972569 A

Priority

  • JP 0108519 W
  • JP 2000296980 A
  • JP 2000296969 A

Abstract (en)

In an engine starter system adapted to crank an engine first in a reverse direction at least under a prescribed condition, and finally in a normal direction, a favorable swing cranking action can be achieved when necessary in a reliable manner. The rotational speed of the electric motor when rotating the crankshaft in the reverse direction is controlled so as to prevent the crankshaft from rotating in the reverse direction beyond the top dead center from the side of the expansion stroke. Thus, by controlling the rotational speed of the crankshaft, the crankshaft is prevented from rotating beyond the top dead center and made to stop at a position immediately before the top dead center. This provides a maximum spring back force of the compression pressure which assists the electric motor in rotating the crankshaft in the normal direction. This assist force, combined with a large approach run distance that can be obtained, ensures a reliable cranking of the engine while minimizing the size and power consumption of the electric motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02N 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 19/005 (2013.01); F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02D 41/042 (2013.01); F02D 2041/0095 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2017 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02N 11/04 (2013.01); F02N 11/0814 (2013.01); F02N 2019/007 (2013.01); F02N 2250/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321667 A1 20030625; EP 1321667 A4 20061227; AU 9228901 A 20020408; CN 1214183 C 20050810; CN 1466657 A 20040107; JP WO2002027182 A1 20040205; WO 0227182 A1 20020404

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081222

2006-12-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061124

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02D 41/34 20060101AFI20061120BHEP

2006-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02N 11/08 20060101ALI20061120BHEP

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI