Global Patent Index - EP 1321668 A1

EP 1321668 A1 2003-06-25 - Apparatus for detecting abnormality of glow plugs

Title (en)

Apparatus for detecting abnormality of glow plugs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Fehlererkennung von Glühkerzen

Title (fr)

Appareil détecteur d'anomalie de bougies de préchauffage

Publication

EP 1321668 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01129852 A

Priority

EP 01129852 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for detecting abnormality of a glow plug (22) without using special circuits or devices. The glow plug (22) is arranged in a diesel engine (2) and is heated by current supplied from a power supply to help start the diesel engine. The apparatus includes a controller (52) that controls the current supplied from the power supply to the glow plug (22). The controller changes the state of the current and determines abnormality of the glow plug based on the difference between an operating condition of the diesel engine before and after the change. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 19/02; F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02P 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 19/027 (2013.01); F02D 41/083 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 03 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 221 (M - 246) 30 September 1983 (1983-09-30)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 089 (M - 132) 27 May 1982 (1982-05-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321668 A1 20030625; EP 1321668 B1 20050427; DE 60110444 D1 20050602; DE 60110444 T2 20060223; ES 2240318 T3 20051016

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131215

2015-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150504

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60110444

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60110444

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-26 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20100430

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240318 T3

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60110444 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011214

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI