Global Patent Index - EP 1321674 A2

EP 1321674 A2 2003-06-25 - Compressor with sound insulation case

Title (en)

Compressor with sound insulation case

Title (de)

Schallgehäuse für Verdichter

Title (fr)

Boitier insonorisant pour compresseurs

Publication

EP 1321674 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02022062 A

Priority

KR 20010083266 A

Abstract (en)

A compressor with a sound insulation case includes: a casing with a closed space; a compressing unit inserted in an upper portion of the casing and performing a compressing operation; a driving unit inserted in a lower portion of the casing and generating a driving force required for the compressing operation of the compressor; and a sound insulation case mounted at an outer circumferential surface of an upper portion of the casing and preventing a noise generated from the compressing unit from leaking outwardly. A noise occurrence of equipment with a compressor installed therein is reduced by installing a sound insulation case outside a casing of the compressor and leakage of a noise generated from the compressor outwardly can be prevented. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 23/00; F04C 18/02; F04C 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/10 (2006.01); F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 23/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/066 (2013.01); F01C 21/10 (2013.01); F04B 39/0033 (2013.01); F04C 18/0207 (2013.01); F04C 23/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321674 A2 20030625; EP 1321674 A3 20030820; EP 1321674 B1 20070711; CN 1228535 C 20051123; CN 1429991 A 20030716; DE 60221091 D1 20070823; DE 60221091 T2 20071025; JP 2003201961 A 20030718; KR 100414121 B1 20040107; KR 20030053197 A 20030628

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60221091

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111004

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60221091 P 20070823

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-07-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI