Global Patent Index - EP 1321675 A1

EP 1321675 A1 2003-06-25 - Pump unit

Title (en)

Pump unit

Title (de)

Pumpenaggregat

Title (fr)

Unité de pompage

Publication

EP 1321675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130795 A

Priority

EP 01130795 A

Abstract (en)

A display device has a source (24) of light inside a casing (18) and a fiber optic light guide (2), which is inserted from outside into an opening (20) in the casing's wall and stretches inside the casing. A light inlet surface (16) turned towards the source of light is provided on the end of the fiber optic light guide.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Pumpenaggregat, an welchem zumindest ein Anzeigeelement vorgesehen ist, wobei das Anzeigeelement eine im Inneren eines Gehäuses (18) angeordnete Lichtquelle (24) und einen Lichtleiter (2) aufweist, der Lichtleiter (2) von außen in eine Öffnung (20) in einer Gehäusewand des Gehäuses eingesetzt ist und sich in das Innere des Gehäuses (18) erstreckt, und an dem Ende (4) des Lichtleiters (2), welches sich in das Innere des Gehäuses (18) erstreckt, eine der Lichtquelle (24) zugewandte Lichteintrittsfläche (16) ausgebildet ist (Figur 5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/06; F04D 15/00; F04D 15/02; F04D 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0088 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3209554 C1 19831013 - BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321675 A1 20030625; EP 1321675 B1 20090909; DE 50115102 D1 20091022

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100610

2009-10-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115102 P 20091022

2009-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-09-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080627

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI