Global Patent Index - EP 1321679 A1

EP 1321679 A1 2003-06-25 - Drive position mechanism with backlash adjustment for variable pipe diffuser

Title (en)

Drive position mechanism with backlash adjustment for variable pipe diffuser

Title (de)

Positionierantriebsvorrichtung mit Spieleinstellung für einen variablen rohrförmigen Diffusor

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de positionnement avec réglage de jeu pour diffuseur tubulaire variable

Publication

EP 1321679 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03004927 A

Priority

  • EP 98630040 A
  • US 90728897 A
  • US 90731997 A

Abstract (en)

A backlash adjustment mechanism comprises a housing 130 having a cylindrical body positioned concentrically about a first centerline 127 and having a bore 129 disposed axially through the body positioned about a second centerline 131. A drive shaft 126 is rotatably disposed concentric with the second centerline within the bore. An inner ring is positioned such that it operably engages a pinion gear 124. The housing 130 is rotatably operable to effect an adjustment of the backlash between the pinion gear 124 and a rack gear 123. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/46; F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/46 (2006.01); F16H 55/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/0246 (2013.01); F04D 29/464 (2013.01); F05D 2250/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0896157 A1 19990210; EP 0896157 B1 20031001; AU 737988 B2 20010906; AU 7877598 A 19990218; BR 9803641 A 19990928; CN 1279300 C 20061011; CN 1538072 A 20041020; DE 69818589 D1 20031106; DE 69818589 T2 20040805; DE 69826901 D1 20041111; DE 69826901 T2 20060309; EP 1321679 A1 20030625; EP 1321679 B1 20041006; ES 2203914 T3 20040416; ES 2225802 T3 20050316; JP 3091179 B2 20000925; JP H11132197 A 19990518; MY 121001 A 20051230; MY 123718 A 20060531; TW 402666 B 20000821

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225802 T3

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826901 P 20041111

2004-10-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0896157 P

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-06-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0896157 P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT