Global Patent Index - EP 1321699 A2

EP 1321699 A2 2003-06-25 - Filter assembly

Title (en)

Filter assembly

Title (de)

Filteranordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de filtration

Publication

EP 1321699 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 03004114 A

Priority

  • EP 98932372 A
  • GB 9714965 A

Abstract (en)

The filter assembly has a filter medium (34) provided with end caps (35,36) that form water-wettable junctions with the filter medium (34). The filter element (34) is encapsulated in a housing (10) which is formed from a plastics material capable of withstanding steam sterilization. This allows the filter element (34) to be steam sterilized in situ and avoids the need for steam autoclaving and aseptic transfer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 31/528; B01D 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/11 (2006.01); B01D 27/00 (2006.01); B01D 35/30 (2006.01); B01D 36/00 (2006.01); B01D 39/16 (2006.01); F16K 31/528 (2006.01); F16L 37/248 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/528 (2013.01); B01D 27/005 (2013.01); B01D 27/08 (2013.01); B01D 36/001 (2013.01); B01D 36/003 (2013.01); F16L 37/248 (2013.01); B01D 2201/088 (2013.01); B01D 2201/16 (2013.01); B01D 2201/4015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 0126508 D0 20020102; GB 2365511 A 20020220; GB 2365511 B 20020327; AU 734627 B2 20010621; AU 8230998 A 19990210; CA 2296400 A1 19990128; DE 69836021 D1 20061109; DE 69836021 T2 20070405; DE 69839971 D1 20081016; DK 0998343 T3 20061023; EP 0998343 A1 20000510; EP 0998343 B1 20060927; EP 1321699 A2 20030625; EP 1321699 A3 20041006; EP 1321699 B1 20080903; ES 2272000 T3 20070416; JP 2001510088 A 20010731; JP 2009022952 A 20090205; US 2005145559 A1 20050707; US 2006091060 A1 20060504; US 2006169630 A1 20060803; US 7273550 B2 20070925; WO 9903568 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69839971

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69839971

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-08-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-03-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081214

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69839971 P 20081016

2008-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0998343 P

2008-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

2008-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR IT LI NL SE

2008-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-05-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050311

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0998343 P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE