Global Patent Index - EP 1321717 A1

EP 1321717 A1 2003-06-25 - Device for releasing a cover of a swing door

Title (en)

Device for releasing a cover of a swing door

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Freigeben einer Schwenktürverkleidung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dégagement pour un habillage de porte pivotante

Publication

EP 1321717 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02293161 A

Priority

FR 0116642 A

Abstract (en)

The door trim (10) for a microwave oven is slidably mounted on the door (8) for movement perpendicular to the pivot axis of the door. A cam is mounted on the door for pivoting around an axis parallel to the door pivot axis. The cam has a transmission to transform a rotational movement of the cam to a translational movement of the trim.

Abstract (fr)

Dans ce dispositif, l'habillage (10) est monté coulissant sur la porte (8) parallèlement à celle-ci et sensiblement perpendiculairement à l'axe de pivotement de la porte. Une came est montée pivotante sur la porte (8) autour d'un axe sensiblement parallèle à l'axe de pivotement de la porte. Des moyens d'entraînement permettant de transformer un mouvement de rotation en un mouvement de translation sont prévus pour transformer un mouvement pivotant de la came en une translation de l'habillage (10) de la porte. Un levier relie la came au bâti sur lequel la porte est montée de manière à provoquer un pivotement de la came lors de l'ouverture et de la fermeture de la porte (8). Application à l'habillage d'une porte d'un four à micro-ondes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321717 A1 20030625; EP 1321717 B1 20051130; AT 311571 T 20051215; DE 60207672 D1 20060105; DE 60207672 T2 20060817; ES 2254627 T3 20060616; FR 2833989 A1 20030627; FR 2833989 B1 20040402

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60207672

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-03-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FAGORBRANDT SAS, RUEIL-MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60207672

2016-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60207672

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2016-03-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-12-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60207672

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60207672

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60207672

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60207672

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091219

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091219

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20051231

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2254627 T3

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-05-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060502

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60207672 P 20060105

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-12-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO