Global Patent Index - EP 1321724 A1

EP 1321724 A1 2003-06-25 - AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

CLIMATISEUR

Publication

EP 1321724 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01986338 A

Priority

  • JP 0106390 W
  • JP 2000300270 A

Abstract (en)

An indoor unit 10 used for air conditioning includes an approximately rectangular discharge port 21, a first flap 35, and a support bracket 46. The first flap 35 is elastic, arranged along the longitudinal direction of the discharge port 21, and supported by the discharge port 21 on both ends thereof and in the central portion thereof. The support bracket 46 is elastic, supports the central portion of the first flap 35, and is fixed on a first end thereof to a first position along the length of the discharge port 21. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/14; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2013.01); F24F 1/0011 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0037 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01); F24F 2013/1473 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321724 A1 20030625; EP 1321724 A4 20041124; EP 1321724 B1 20071128; AU 3822502 A 20020415; AU 757784 B2 20030306; CN 1141527 C 20040310; CN 1346955 A 20020501; CN 2505758 Y 20020814; DE 60131667 D1 20080110; DE 60131667 T2 20081030; EP 1808647 A1 20070718; ES 2294041 T3 20080401; JP 2002106947 A 20020410; JP 3709777 B2 20051026; WO 0229334 A1 20020411

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160725

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160724

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160724

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160724

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60131667

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071128

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2294041 T3

2008-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60131667 P 20080110

2007-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2007-07-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061222

2004-11-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/14 A

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 1/00 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR