Global Patent Index - EP 1321725 A1

EP 1321725 A1 2003-06-25 - Device particularly for reducing the noise emitted by air conditioners

Title (en)

Device particularly for reducing the noise emitted by air conditioners

Title (de)

Vorrichtung insbesondere zur Verringerung der von Klimaanlagen hervorgerufenen Geräuschbelastung

Title (fr)

Dispositif particulièrement pour réduire le bruit des climatiseurs

Publication

EP 1321725 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02027607 A

Priority

IT PD20010297 A

Abstract (en)

A device (10) particularly for reducing the noise emitted by air conditioners (11), comprising at least one acoustic resonator (18), with noise reduction effectiveness over a low-frequency range, arranged at an air passage cavity located inside the air conditioner (11), in a region where the air flow is substantially uniform. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/24 (2013.01); F24F 2013/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321725 A1 20030625; IT PD20010297 A1 20030623

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160701

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080207

2008-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EMERSON NETWORK POWER S.R.L.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI