Global Patent Index - EP 1321727 A2

EP 1321727 A2 2003-06-25 - Heat pump type air conditioner

Title (en)

Heat pump type air conditioner

Title (de)

Wärmepumpenartige Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Conditionneur d'air de type pompe à chaleur

Publication

EP 1321727 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02023360 A

Priority

KR 20010081991 A

Abstract (en)

In a heat pump type air conditioner capable of maintaining a room temperature constantly by including two outdoor heat exchangers (16,18) and performing a heating operation with one heat exchanger when the other heat exchanger performs a defrosting operation, the heat pump type air conditioner includes a compressor (12) for compressing a coolant; a four-way valve (14) for switching a flow of the coolant normally or reversely; a first and a second outdoor heat exchangers (16,18) respectively installed outdoors, used as a condenser in cooling and used as an evaporator in heating; plural indoor heat exchangers respectively installed at each indoor space and performing a cooling/heating operation; a first and a second outdoor expansion valves (20,22) respectively installed at coolant pipes for connecting the first and second outdoor heat exchangers (16,18) with the indoor heat exchangers (8a,8b) in order to turn the coolant into a low temperature-low pressure state and open/close the coolant pipes; and a control unit (6) for making one of the first and second outdoor heat exchangers (16,18) perform a defrosting operation and making the rest perform a heating operation by controlling the first and second outdoor expansion valves (20,22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F25B 13/00 (2006.01); F25B 29/00 (2006.01); F25B 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 13/00 (2013.01); F25B 2313/0233 (2013.01); F25B 2313/0251 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321727 A2 20030625; EP 1321727 A3 20031119; EP 1321727 B1 20070425; CN 1190640 C 20050223; CN 1430030 A 20030716; DE 60219753 D1 20070606; DE 60219753 T2 20070816; JP 2003194384 A 20030709; JP 3816860 B2 20060830; KR 100442392 B1 20040730; KR 20030051091 A 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171031

2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180501

2018-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180629

2018-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171018

2018-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60219753

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-09-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080128

2007-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60219753 P 20070606

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LG ELECTRONICS INC.

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040513

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI