Global Patent Index - EP 1321731 A1

EP 1321731 A1 2003-06-25 - Energy transmitter as part of a coating and/or drying plant, especially for a paint coating

Title (en)

Energy transmitter as part of a coating and/or drying plant, especially for a paint coating

Title (de)

Energietransmitter als Bestandteil einer Beschichtungs- und/oder Trockenanlage, insbesondere für eine Lackbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Transmetteur d'énergie faisant partie d'une installation de revêtement et/ou de séchage, notamment pour un revêtement de peinture

Publication

EP 1321731 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130788 A

Priority

EP 01130788 A

Abstract (en)

Energy transmitter with transmitter-surface elements which include antenna elements, each element having a glass support plate, a radiation layer on the glass rear face, with its opposite free glass front face in a position for an object to be dried or a surface of a structural element with a deposited coating material. <??>An energy transmitter as a component of a coating and/or drying unit, especially for deposition of paint coatings, where the energy transmitter (1) has at least two transmitter-surface elements (TSE) (10) which include antenna elements, each element (10) has a glass support plate (11), a radiation layer (13) on the glass rear face (12), with its opposite free glass front face (17) in a position for an object to be dried or a surface of a structural element (3) with a deposited coating material, a distance from and parallel to the glass rear face (2) and a flat metal reflector (20). <??>The radiation layer (13) emits electromagnetic radiation within a frequency band, which covers at least the characteristic frequencies in the ultrared of an object to be dried or of a coating material, and the radiation layer (13) by mean of a control device (16) can be excited for emission over at least one frequency band, so that the characteristic frequencies of the object to be dried or the coating material can be excited in resonance (sic).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Energietransmitter (1) als Bestandteil einer Beschichtungs- und/oder Trockenanlage (2), insbesondere für eine Lackbeschichtung. Erfindungsgemäß umfasst der Energietransmitter (1) wenigstens zwei Transmitter-Flächenelemente (10) als Antennenelemente, wobei jedes der Transmitter-Flächenelemente (10) eine Glasträgerplatte (11) aufweist, die auf einer Glasrückfläche (12) eine Abstrahlschicht (13) trägt und deren gegenüberliegende freie Glasvorderfläche (17) auf eine Position für ein zu trocknendes Objekt oder eine Oberfläche eines Bauteils (3) mit aufgetragenem Beschichtungsmaterial gerichtet ist. Weiter ist im Abstand in etwa parallel zu der Glasrückfläche (12) und wenigstens in deren Größe ein Flächenreflektor (20) aus Metallmaterial angeordnet, wobei die jeweilige Abstrahlschicht (13) zur Abgabe einer elektromagnetischer Strahlung in einem Frequenzband ausgelegt ist und das Frequenzband wenigstens charakteristische Eigenfrequenzen im Ultrarot eines zu trocknenden Objekts oder Beschichtungsmaterials überdeckt und wobei die Abstrahlschicht (13) mittels einer Steuereinrichtung (16) zur Abgabe des wenigstens einen Frequenzbandes anregbar ist, so dass Eigenfrequenzen des zu trocknenden Objekts oder des Beschichtungsmaterials in Resonanz anregbar sind. Dabei ist die Abstrahlschicht (13) mittels der Steuereinrichtung (16) so zur Abgabe eines bestimmten Frequenzbandes anregbar, dass Eigenfrequenzen des Beschichtungsmaterials in Resonanz angeregt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/347 (2006.01); B05C 9/14 (2006.01); F26B 3/30 (2006.01); F26B 15/12 (2006.01); F26B 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321731 A1 20030625; EP 1321731 B1 20060712; AU 2002352202 A1 20030715; CA 2471344 A1 20030710; CN 1608192 A 20050420; DE 50110461 D1 20060824; DK 1321731 T3 20061113; EA 007500 B1 20061027; EA 200400859 A1 20041230; ES 2267660 T3 20070316; JP 2005512810 A 20050512; PT 1321731 E 20061130; US 2005069310 A1 20050331; WO 03056262 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071224

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071224

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061013

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071224

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080623

2008-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-08-04 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071222

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-04 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080623

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MOLETHERM HOLDING A.G.

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2267660 T3

2007-03-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-01-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-18 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-12-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403444

2006-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110461 P 20060824

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI