Global Patent Index - EP 1321737 A2

EP 1321737 A2 2003-06-25 - Tube-launched projectiles with an over-calibre fin unit

Title (en)

Tube-launched projectiles with an over-calibre fin unit

Title (de)

Aus einem Rohr zu verschiessender Flugkörper mit überkalibrigem Leitwerk

Title (fr)

Projectiles à empennage sur-calibré lancés à partir d'un canon

Publication

EP 1321737 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027993 A

Priority

DE 10162136 A

Abstract (en)

Missile (12) for shooting out of a pipe comprises a tail unit (14) at the rear (10) which is moved from a sub-caliber position into a super-caliber functional position. A securing pot (18) having a pot casing (22) and a pot base (24) is temporarily fixed on the rear so that the tail unit is held in its sub-caliber position by the pot casing and so that a pressure chamber (32) is formed between the rear end surface (26) of the missile and the pot base. The pot base has at least one propellant gas inlet (34) opening into the pressure chamber. <??>Preferred Features: The pot casing is sealed in a pressure-tight manner against the rear of the missile using at least one sealing ring (40) arranged behind the tail unit.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein aus einem gezogenen Rohr (66) zu verschießender Flugkörper (12) beschrieben. Dieser weist an seinem Heck (10) Leitwerks-Flügel (14) auf, die von einer unterkalibrigen Verbringungsstellung in eine überkalibrige Funktionsstellung ausklappbar sind. Zum Schutz der eingeklappten Flügel (14) und zum Schutz weiterer heckseitiger ballistischer und sensorischer Strukturen des Flugkörpers (12) ist am Heck (10) des Flugkörpers (12) ein Sicherungstopf (18) temporär festgelegt, der einen Topfmantel (22) und einen Topfboden (24) aufweist. Zwischen der Heckstirnfläche (26) des Flugkörpers (12) und dem Topfboden (24) des Sicherungstopfes (18) ist ein Druckraum (32) vorhanden. Der Topfboden (24) weist mindestens einen in den Druckraum (32) einmündenden Treibgaseinlaß (34) auf. Beim Abschuß des Flugkörpers (12) aus dem Rohr strömt Treibgas durch den Treibgaseinlaß (34) in den Druckraum (32) ein, so daß im Druckraum (32) ein entsprechend hoher Treibgasdruck entsteht. Nach Verlassen des Rohres wird dann die Druckdifferenz zwischen dem Gasdruck im Druckraum (32) und der umgebenden Atmosphäre wirksam, wodurch der Sicherungstopf (18) vom Heck (10) des Flugkörpers (12) abgetrennt wird und die Flügel (14) von der eingeklappten Lagerstellung in die ausgeklappte Flugstellung aufgestellt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/14; F42B 10/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/18 (2006.01); F42B 10/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/20 (2013.01); F42B 10/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321737 A2 20030625; EP 1321737 A3 20040512; DE 10162136 A1 20030710; DE 10162136 B4 20041014; US 2004004156 A1 20040108; US 6769643 B2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041113

2005-03-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 42B 10/14 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 42B 10/20 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO