Global Patent Index - EP 1321752 A1

EP 1321752 A1 2003-06-25 - Temperature threshold sensor with means for testing at ambiant temperature

Title (en)

Temperature threshold sensor with means for testing at ambiant temperature

Title (de)

Temperaturpegeldetektor mit Mitteln zum Testen bei Umgebungstemperatur

Title (fr)

Capteur de température à seuil comprenant des moyens de test à température ambiante

Publication

EP 1321752 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02028475 A

Priority

FR 0116765 A

Abstract (en)

Integrated circuit temperature sensor (21) delivers output signals (S1, S2) from means (MC1, CP1; MC1, CP2) for detection of the exceeding of two temperature thresholds. Additional means (MC1, MX1, CP1; MC1, MX2, CP2) are provided for detecting a third and fourth temperature threshold linked to the first and second temperature thresholds respectively such that a deviation in the first or second threshold detection causes a change in the third or fourth. <??>The invention also relates to a corresponding method.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un capteur de température intégré (21) délivrant des signaux (S1, S2) de détection de dépassement de seuils de température, comprenant des moyens (MC1, CP1) de détection d'un premier seuil de température présentant un premier seuil de détection, et des moyens (MC1, CP2) de détection d'un second seuil de température présentant un second seuil de détection. Selon l'invention, le capteur comprend des moyens (MC1, MX1, CP1) de détection d'un troisième seuil de température compris entre les premier et second seuils de température, présentant un troisième seuil de détection lié au premier seuil de détection de manière qu'une déviation du premier seuil de détection entraîne une déviation correspondante du troisième seuil de détection, et des moyens (MC1, MX2, CP2) de détection d'un quatrième seuil de température compris entre les premier et second seuils de température, présentant un quatrième seuil de détection lié au second seuil de détection. Avantage : contrôle des premier et second seuils de détection à température ambiante. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01K 15/00; G01K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01K 3/00 (2006.01); G01K 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01K 3/005 (2013.01); G01K 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 6288638 B1 20010911 - TANGUAY WILLIAM P [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321752 A1 20030625; FR 2834064 A1 20030627; US 2003118079 A1 20030626; US 6997606 B2 20060214

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120703

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090921

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO