Global Patent Index - EP 1321817 A1

EP 1321817 A1 2003-06-25 - Method for recognizing disorders or damage and device for treating photographic sheetlike supports

Title (en)

Method for recognizing disorders or damage and device for treating photographic sheetlike supports

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erkennen von Störungen oder Schäden und Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von fotografischen Schichtträgern

Title (fr)

Méthode de reconnaître des déficiences ou des dégâts et dispositif de traitement de supports de couches photographiques en forme de feuilles

Publication

EP 1321817 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130720 A

Priority

EP 01130720 A

Abstract (en)

Method whereby photographic film being processed passes through an automatic scratch identifier arrangement. Scratch patterns are analyzed and associated with certain device damage or disruption. When such scratch patterns are detected on the film, a warning is generated and or the device concerned is stopped. <??>An Independent claim is made for a film processing system with at least one unit for detection and identification of scratches on the film surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einem Verfahren zum Erkennen von Störungen oder Schäden in Geräten zur Bearbeitung von fotografischen Schichtträgern, die zu einer Beschädigung der fotografischen Schichtträger führen. Erfindungsgemäß durchlaufen die fotografischen Schichtträger eine automatische Kratzererkennung, bestimmte Kratzeranordnungen werden analysiert und einer Störung oder einem Geräteschaden zugeordnet und es wird eine Warnung generiert und/oder das betroffene Gerät gestoppt. In einer Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von fotografischen Schichtträgern ist erfindungsgemäß ein Speicher vorgesehen, in dem Kratzeranordnungen abgelegt sind, die auf eine Störung oder einen Schaden eines Gerätes oder Geräteteils der Vorrichtung hindeuten. Weiterhin ist eine Vergleichseinrichtung vorgesehen, mit der erkannte Kratzeranordnungen und in dem Speicher abgelegte Kratzeranordnungen vergleichbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 13/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] KASPAR H: "KRATZEN VERBOTEN", MFM FOTOTECHNIK, AGT VERLAG THUM, DE, vol. 45, no. 11, 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), pages 25, XP000721495, ISSN: 0024-8142

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321817 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050921

2009-11-04 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20100401

2006-04-26 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFAPHOTO GMBH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI