Global Patent Index - EP 1321831 A1

EP 1321831 A1 2003-06-25 - Jump-dial watch and mechanism for quick update of time zone

Title (en)

Jump-dial watch and mechanism for quick update of time zone

Title (de)

Uhr mit springenden Stunden und Mechanismus zum schnellen Wechsel von Zeitzonen

Title (fr)

Montre à heures sautantes et mécanisme pour la mise à l'heure rapide du fuseau horaire

Publication

EP 1321831 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01204844 A

Priority

EP 01204844 A

Abstract (en)

Analogue timepieces has a jumping hours mechanism that is based on a time zone corrector (38) positioned using a knob (10) that enable simultaneous rotation of two stars (20, 24) thus allowing simultaneous adjustment of an hour indication and the town appearing in a display.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/22; G04B 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/20 (2006.01); G04B 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/202 (2013.01); G04B 19/223 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[A] CH 282571 A4 19740930 - SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321831 A1 20030625; EP 1321831 B1 20091104; AT 447732 T 20091115; DE 60140374 D1 20091217

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: BLANCPLAIN SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FREDERIC PIGUET S.A., CH

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100805

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091104

2010-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2009-12-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60140374 P 20091217

2009-11-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2009-11-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071001

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI