Global Patent Index - EP 1321832 A1

EP 1321832 A1 2003-06-25 - Timepiece comprising a mechanism for indicating lunar phases with backward reversal

Title (en)

Timepiece comprising a mechanism for indicating lunar phases with backward reversal

Title (de)

Eine Uhr, bestehend aus einem Mechanismus zum anzeigen der Mondphasen mit rückläufiger Umstellung

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie comprenant un mécanisme indicateur des phases de lune à retour rétrograde

Publication

EP 1321832 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01205017 A

Priority

EP 01205017 A

Abstract (en)

Watch has a moon phase indicator (8), a needle (30) controlled by a mechanism comprising a moon phase wheel (17) held in position by a ratchet (19) and driven in a stepwise manner by means of a pin or a finger (14) integral with a drive wheel (13) that makes one turn every 24 hours and that is in turn driven directly or indirectly by the hour wheel. The indicator is driven by an alternating kinematic chain formed by a balance lever (20) with two arms (22, 24), a spring (23) and cam (18) linked to the moon phase wheel.

Abstract (fr)

La pièce d'horlogerie comporte un organe indicateur des phases de lune (8), une aiguille (30) actionnée par un mécanisme comprenant une roue des phases de lune (17) maintenu en position par un sautoir (19) et entraînée pas à pas par au moins un piton ou un doigt (14) solidaire d'une roue entraîneuse (13) effectuant un tour en 24h en étant en prise directement ou indirectement avec un pignon entraîneur (11) de la roue des heures. La pièce d'horlogerie est caractérisée en ce que l'organe indicateur est relié au mécanisme par une chaîne cinématique alternative formée par une bascule (20) à deux bras (22, 24), un première bras (22) étant maintenu par un ressort de rappel (23) en appui sur une came (18) solidaire de la roue des phases de lune (17), ladite came (18) ayant un contour formé au moins par un colimaçon définissant une première position basse (18a) dans laquelle le deuxième bras (24) de commande positionne l'aiguille (30) au début d'une lunaison et une deuxième position haute (18b) dans laquelle le deuxième bras (24) positionne l'aiguille (30) à la fin de ladite lunaison, le passage de la position haute (18b) à la position basse (18a) sous l'action du ressort de rappel (23) entraînant ladite aiguille (30) dans un mouvement rétrograde au début du cycle d'une nouvelle lunaison. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] CH 1018 A 18890826 - PATEK PHILIPPE & CIE [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321832 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090602

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071218

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI