Global Patent Index - EP 1321874 A1

EP 1321874 A1 2003-06-25 - System, program and method for handling of electronic form and computer-readable recording medium recording the same

Title (en)

System, program and method for handling of electronic form and computer-readable recording medium recording the same

Title (de)

System, Programm und Methode für Handhabung elektronischer Form und computerlesbarem Aufzeichnungsmedium, die dieselbe aufzeichnen

Title (fr)

Système, le programme et la méthode pour la manipulation de formulair électronique, et le support d'enregistrement lisible par l'ordinateur, enregistrant le même

Publication

EP 1321874 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02027862 A

Priority

  • JP 2001388571 A
  • JP 2002169097 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a technique for allowing a user lack of high level technical knowledge on a program of an approval route to easily create an electric form template. For creating an electric form template having an application part where an application item to be approved is input and an address part where one or more approval officers to approve the application item are specified, a plurality of approval routes each having an approval function to obtain approval of an approval officer for an electric form are prepared, so that an address part and a necessary approval function can be incorporated into a template by selecting an approval pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 10/06 (2012.01); G06Q 10/10 (2012.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

No Search

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321874 A1 20030625; JP 2003248746 A 20030905; JP 3685155 B2 20050817; US 2003145276 A1 20030731; US 7089488 B2 20060808

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070314

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO