Global Patent Index - EP 1321909 A1

EP 1321909 A1 2003-06-25 - Vending device which obstructs the entrance to a shop when the shop is shut

Title (en)

Vending device which obstructs the entrance to a shop when the shop is shut

Title (de)

Verkaufsvorrichtung, die den Eingang zu einem Laden sperrt, während der Laden geschlossen ist

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution automatique de produits formant condamnation temporaire de l'accès à un magasin pendant les heures de fermeture

Publication

EP 1321909 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356269 A

Priority

FR 0116796 A

Abstract (en)

Automatic vending machine for distribution of food products comprises a cabinet and a support frame. The frame has means for fixing and anchorage it in a temporary location. The frame and cabinet can be removed when not being used.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un dispositif de distribution automatique de produits de consommation, notamment des denrées alimentaires, principalement caractérisé en ce qu'il associe une armoire (4) de distribution automatique, un bâti (5) support de la dite armoire, le dit bâti comportant des moyens de fixation et de maintien de l'armoire sur le bâti, des moyens d'ancrage temporaire dudit bâti en un emplacement prédéterminé d'un magasin de distribution, et des moyens permettant le déplacement dudit bâti. L'ensemble de l'armoire et du bâti peut ainsi être déplacé jusqu'à l'embrasure de la porte du magasin, et constituer une interdiction de l'accès au magasin tout en permettant la distribution pendant les heures de fermeture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321909 A1 20030625; FR 2834106 A1 20030627; FR 2834106 B1 20040402

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060802

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO